+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 37
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2017: Roll 680
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
April 25, 2017: Roll 681
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
April 11, 2017: Roll 549
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
February 28, 2017: Roll 159
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
February 16, 2017: Roll 37
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor