+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 943
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Garrett Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 341
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 342
- Hanes intended to vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2016: Roll 943
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2016: Roll 341
- Yeas: 105
March 22, 2016: Roll 342
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor