+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2014-125.
- Delivered to Governor at 11:18 a.m. on February 27, 2014.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 551
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Brown Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 209
- Engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 551
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor