+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on May 7, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-167.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 819
- Third Reading Passed
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2015: Roll 819
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
April 14, 2015: Roll 401
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor