+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Governmental Affairs with 1 amendment
- Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Brown Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 211
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 212
- Greeson intended to vote "Nay "
- Engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 211
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 212
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor