+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Ready to Enroll
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1115
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 625
- Hill 1st Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 626
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 627
- Engrossed
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- Judiciary 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1115 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 16, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 625 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 626 Vote
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 9
April 16, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 627 Vote
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor