+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB931 amended into LB901 by AM2233
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM1924 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1924
On January 21, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Health and Human Services AM1924
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor