+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0967)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 967 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB442ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 967963320-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Ms. Crouch agreed to (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 967963320-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 967963320-EH1
- Passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 967963320-H1
On January 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 961011320
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor