+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319.
On July 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 538.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Angus S. King, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor