+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in P. & E. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB391E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 044744780-E
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 044744780
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2004: Continued to 2005 in P. & E. (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor