+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (9-Y 5-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (68-Y 32-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 040997236-H1
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 29-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee sub. (66-Y 29-N) HB1315H1
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Engrossed by House - committee sub. (68-Y 29-N) HB1315H1
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT #2 (68-Y 29-N)
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 040997236-H1
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 048368236
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2004: Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (9-Y 5-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 32-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 29-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT #2 (68-Y 29-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor