+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 65 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0022
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0022
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0022
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0022
- Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 20, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Corporations
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 27, 2015: Corporations
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections & Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor