+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: June 3, 2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Received in Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2014: SA Concurred in
- Yeas: 98
February 12, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 32
April 24, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (96)
Type:
Primary Sponsor