+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued - Action Postponed H Select Committee on Insurance
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8)
- Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance w/HCA 1
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance w/Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Health Insurance Committee
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(0607S07.02S)
- SA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(0607S07.08S)
- SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0607S07.09S)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(0607S07.05S)
- SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(0607S07.03S)
- SA 11 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0607S07.17S)
- SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0607S07.12S)
- SA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0607S07.13S)
- SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0607S07.14S)
- SA 9 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0607S07.07S)
- SA 10 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0607S07.15S)
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (Sater)--(0607S.07F)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0607S07.01S)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 63 & 111) S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0607S.05C)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 63-Sater
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (13)
0607S07.17S
Adopted
0607S07.15S
Adopted
0607S07.14S
Adopted
0607S07.07S
Adopted
0607S07.13S
Adopted
0607S07.12S
Adopted
0607S07.09S
Adopted
0607S07.03S
Adopted
0607S07.05S
Adopted
0607S07.08S
Adopted
0607S07.02S
Adopted, as amended
0607S07.01S
Adopted
0607S.07F
Adopted, as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor