+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
- Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means w/HCA 1 to HCA 1, HCA 1 as amended & HCA 2
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means w/Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Ways and Means Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0147S03.01S)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0147S.03C)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 18-Kraus
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0147S03.01S
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor