+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Committee of Origin
- Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(5385S06.01S)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS for SCS S offered (Dempsey)--(5385S.06F)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5385S.05C)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 774-Dempsey
+ − Amendments (2)
5385S06.01S
Adopted
5385S.06F
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor