TrackBill

MO - HB1495 Requires Missouri Technology Corporations to distribute money to specified early stage business development corporations for grants to newly formed businesses that have the potential for sales or development of new technologies

  • Last action:  House Message (May 15, 2014)
Receive real-time alerts on bill, committee, and legislator activity.Get Started
  • Summary as Perfected

    Link to PDF document

  • On May 15, 2014 in the House
    House Message
    On May 14, 2014 in the House
    House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES TORPEY, SWAN, SCHUPP
    On May 14, 2014 in the Senate
    Senate Message Senate Conference Committee Appointed - DIXON, SCHMITT, SCHAEFER, JUSTUS, KEAVENY Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
    On May 14, 2014 in the House
    House Message House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference Taken Up
    On May 12, 2014 in the House
    Reported to the House with... - SS
    On May 12, 2014 in the Senate
    Third Read and Passed - AYES: 26 NOES: 4 SS Adopted Taken Up for Third Reading
    On May 5, 2014 in the Senate
    Placed on Informal Calendar Senate Substitute Offered - SS#2 SS Withdrawn Taken Up for Third Reading
    On Apr 22, 2014 in the Senate
    Placed on Informal Calendar Senate Substitute Offered Taken Up for Third Reading
    On Apr 16, 2014 in the Senate
    Reported Do Pass Voted Do Pass Executive Session Held
    On Apr 15, 2014 in the Senate
    Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
    On Apr 14, 2014 in the Senate
    Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
    On Apr 10, 2014 in the Senate
    SCS Reported Do Pass
    On Apr 9, 2014 in the Senate
    Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
    On Apr 2, 2014 in the Senate
    Public Hearing Held Public Hearing Scheduled - Senate Lounge upon noon recess.
    On Mar 27, 2014 in the Senate
    Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
    On Mar 10, 2014 in the Senate
    Reported to the Senate and First Read
    On Mar 6, 2014 in the House
    Third Read and Passed - AYES: 117 NOES: 35 Taken Up for Third Reading Reported Do Pass Voted Do Pass Executive Session Completed
    On Mar 5, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Fiscal Review Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED Taken Up for Perfection
    On Feb 20, 2014 in the House
    Rules - Reported Do Pass Rules - Voted Do Pass Rules - Executive Session Completed
    On Feb 11, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Rules Reported Do Pass
    On Feb 10, 2014 in the House
    Voted Do Pass Executive Session Completed
    On Feb 5, 2014 in the House
    Action Postponed Executive Session Continued
    On Jan 29, 2014 in the House
    Public Hearing Completed
    On Jan 22, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business
    On Jan 21, 2014 in the House
    Read Second Time
    On Jan 16, 2014 in the House
    Introduced and Read First Time
  • Distributed

    5283H01.01H

    Distributed

    5283H01.04H

    Distributed

    5283H01.03F

    Adopted

    5283H01.03H

    Distributed

    5283H01.02F

    Distributed

    5283H01.02H

    Distributed

    5283H01.01L

    Adopted

    5283H01.01F

    Distributed

Back to top