TrackBill

MO - HB1171 Establishes the Economic-Education Partnership Act, which allows employers to retain withholding taxes up to the amount spent on educational benefits for employees and unpaid interns or up to the amount spent on educational benefits for employees and unpaid interns or up to the amount spent on job training for employees

  • Last action:  Rules - Reported Do Pass (May 1, 2014)
Receive real-time alerts on bill, committee, and legislator activity.Get Started
  • Summary as Committee

    Link to PDF document

  • On May 1, 2014 in the House
    Rules - Reported Do Pass Rules - Voted Do Pass Rules - Executive Session Completed
    On Apr 23, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Rules HCS Reported Do Pass
    On Mar 4, 2014 in the House
    HCS Voted Do Pass Bill Reconsidered Executive Session Completed
    On Feb 18, 2014 in the House
    Voted Do Pass Executive Session Completed
    On Feb 11, 2014 in the House
    Public Hearing Completed
    On Jan 16, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Economic Development
    On Jan 9, 2014 in the House
    Read Second Time
    On Jan 8, 2014 in the House
    Read First Time
    On Dec 12, 2013 in the House
    Prefiled
Back to top