TrackBill

MO - HB1124 Changes the laws regarding "all-terrain vehicles," "recreational off-highway vehicles," and "utility vehicles"

  • Last action:  Reported to the House with... - SS SCS (May 7, 2014)
Receive real-time alerts on bill, committee, and legislator activity.Get Started
  • Summary as Perfected

    Link to PDF document

  • On May 7, 2014 in the House
    Reported to the House with... - SS SCS
    On May 7, 2014 in the Senate
    Third Read and Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 SS Adopted Senate Substitute Offered Taken Up for Third Reading Placed on Informal Calendar
    On May 6, 2014 in the Senate
    SCS Reported Do Pass
    On May 1, 2014 in the Senate
    Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
    On Apr 30, 2014 in the Senate
    Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING GALLERY Public Hearing Held
    On Apr 28, 2014 in the Senate
    Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
    On Apr 23, 2014 in the Senate
    Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure
    On Apr 22, 2014 in the Senate
    Reported to the Senate and First Read
    On Apr 17, 2014 in the House
    Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 9 Taken Up for Third Reading
    On Apr 15, 2014 in the House
    Perfected with Amendments - ha 1, ha 2 adopted HCS Adopted Taken Up for Perfection
    On Mar 13, 2014 in the House
    Rules - Reported Do Pass Rules - Voted Do Pass Rules - Executive Session Completed
    On Mar 6, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Rules HCS Reported Do Pass
    On Feb 4, 2014 in the House
    HCS Voted Do Pass Executive Session Completed
    On Jan 28, 2014 in the House
    Public Hearing Completed
    On Jan 9, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Agriculture Policy Read Second Time
    On Jan 8, 2014 in the House
    Read First Time
    On Dec 4, 2013 in the House
    Prefiled
  • 4778H02.13H

    Distributed

    4778H02.10H

    Distributed

    4778H02.11H

    Distributed

    4778H02.12H

    Distributed

    4778H02.05H

    Adopted

    4778H02.07H

    Adopted

    4778H02.09H

    Distributed

    4778H02.01L

    Distributed

Back to top