About TrackBill

TrackBill is the simplest, fastest, and lowest-cost solution to stay informed on legislation.
Track 10 bills free and start receiving real-time, daily, or weekly updates.

Learn More
  • Summary as Committee

    Link to PDF document

  • On Mar 24, 2014 in the House
    Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent Rules - Executive Session Completed
    On Mar 12, 2014 in the House
    Referred: Rules HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
    On Feb 12, 2014 in the House
    HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent Executive Session Completed
    On Jan 29, 2014 in the House
    Action Postponed Executive Session Continued
    On Jan 15, 2014 in the House
    Public Hearing Completed
    On Jan 9, 2014 in the House
    Referred: International Trade Read Second Time
    On Jan 8, 2014 in the House
    Read First Time
    On Dec 2, 2013 in the House
    Prefiled
Back to top

About TrackBill

TrackBill is the simplest, fastest, and lowest-cost solution to stay informed on legislation.
Track 10 bills free and start receiving real-time, daily, or weekly updates.

Learn More