TrackBill

IL - SB1666 GENETICALLY ENGINEERED FOOD

  • Last action:  Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado (May 15, 2014)
Receive real-time alerts on bill, committee, and legislator activity.Get Started
  • Summary as Introduced

    Creates the Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings and the purpose of the Act. Provides that beginning on the effective date of the Act, any food offered for retail sale in this State is misbranded if it is entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering and that fact is not disclosed in a certain manner. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to require either the listing or identification of any ingredient or ingredients that were genetically engineered, nor that the term "genetically engineered" be placed immediately preceding any common name or primary product descriptor of a food. Provides that until the effective date of the Act, any processed food that would be subject to the provision concerning the labeling of genetically engineered foods solely because it includes one or more materials produced by genetic engineering is not misbranded provided that the engineered materials in the aggregate do not account for more than a certain amount of the total weight of the processed food. Sets forth provisions concerning applicability and the right of action for violations, damages, and attorneys' fees. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules necessary to implement the Act. Contains a severability provision.

  • On May 15, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
    On Apr 11, 2014 in the Senate
    Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
    On Mar 28, 2014 in the Senate
    Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
    On Mar 25, 2014 in the Senate
    Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
    On Mar 21, 2014 in the Senate
    Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler Re-assigned to Agriculture and Conservation Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado
    On Mar 5, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
    On Feb 26, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
    On Feb 20, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
    On Feb 19, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
    On Feb 11, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
    On Feb 7, 2014 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
    On Nov 6, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
    On Oct 22, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
    On Sep 4, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
    On Jul 30, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
    On Jul 29, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
    On Jul 8, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
    On Jun 24, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
    On May 21, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
    On May 16, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
    On Mar 22, 2013 in the Senate
    Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
    On Mar 14, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
    On Mar 12, 2013 in the Senate
    To Subcommittee on Food Labeling
    On Mar 7, 2013 in the Senate
    Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
    On Feb 28, 2013 in the Senate
    Re-assigned to Agriculture and Conservation Re-referred to Assignments
    On Feb 27, 2013 in the Senate
    Assigned to Environment
    On Feb 13, 2013 in the Senate
    Referred to Assignments First Reading Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
  • New Act
Back to top